California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 13, 2011
Bill June 29, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011