LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB427
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB427
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB427
Compare Versions
AB427 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB427 Enrolled September 6, 2011
AB427 Amended August 15, 2011
AB427 Amended July 13, 2011
AB427 Amended June 29, 2011
AB427 Amended March 29, 2011
AB427 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB427 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB427 Enrolled September 6, 2011
AB427 Amended August 15, 2011
AB427 Amended July 13, 2011
AB427 Amended June 29, 2011
AB427 Amended March 29, 2011
AB427 Introduced February 14, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare