|
09/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 355, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2548.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1037.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
|
|
|
|
01/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|