LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB44
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB44
Compare Versions
AB44 Chaptered September 29, 2011
AB44 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB44 Amended July 12, 2011
AB44 Amended March 24, 2011
AB44 Amended January 27, 2011
AB44 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB44 Chaptered September 29, 2011
AB44 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB44 Amended July 12, 2011
AB44 Amended March 24, 2011
AB44 Amended January 27, 2011
AB44 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare