LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB44
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB44
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 6, 2010
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 29, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 29, 2011
Compare
Amended
Bill
July 12, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 24, 2011
Compare
Bill
January 27, 2011
Compare