|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 496, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 31). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 11. Page 6753.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6685.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5006.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 8).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 1336.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|