California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB481 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill April 5, 2011