LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB481
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB481
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB481
Compare Versions
AB481 Chaptered September 24, 2012
AB481 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB481 Amended August 13, 2012
AB481 Amended August 6, 2012
AB481 Amended June 25, 2012
AB481 Amended April 5, 2011
AB481 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB481 Chaptered September 24, 2012
AB481 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB481 Amended August 13, 2012
AB481 Amended August 6, 2012
AB481 Amended June 25, 2012
AB481 Amended April 5, 2011
AB481 Introduced February 15, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare