|
04/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 18, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 724.).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 437.).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 17). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 482.)
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 441.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (February 24).
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 14).
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|