California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill March 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill April 7, 2011

Amended

Bill March 17, 2011
Bill February 18, 2011
Bill February 3, 2011