LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB50
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB50
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB50
Compare Versions
AB50 Chaptered April 7, 2011
AB50 Enrolled March 29, 2011
AB50 Amended March 17, 2011
AB50 Amended February 18, 2011
AB50 Amended February 3, 2011
AB50 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB50 Chaptered April 7, 2011
AB50 Enrolled March 29, 2011
AB50 Amended March 17, 2011
AB50 Amended February 18, 2011
AB50 Amended February 3, 2011
AB50 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare