|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 414, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6091.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4579.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 3592.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|