LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB53
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB53
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB53
Compare Versions
AB53 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB53 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB53 Amended August 13, 2012
AB53 Amended July 5, 2012
AB53 Amended June 19, 2012
AB53 Amended January 10, 2012
AB53 Amended May 19, 2011
AB53 Amended May 11, 2011
AB53 Amended March 21, 2011
AB53 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB53 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB53 Enrolled August 27, 2012
AB53 Amended August 13, 2012
AB53 Amended July 5, 2012
AB53 Amended June 19, 2012
AB53 Amended January 10, 2012
AB53 Amended May 19, 2011
AB53 Amended May 11, 2011
AB53 Amended March 21, 2011
AB53 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare