LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB53
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB53
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB53
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 6, 2010
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 27, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 21, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 13, 2012
Compare
Bill
July 5, 2012
Compare
Bill
June 19, 2012
Compare
Bill
January 10, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 19, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 11, 2011
Compare
Bill
March 21, 2011
Compare