|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 512, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 3052.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2361.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1818.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|