California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill August 30, 2011
Bill August 24, 2011
Bill August 22, 2011
Bill July 11, 2011
Bill June 22, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 19, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011
Bill April 4, 2011
Bill March 29, 2011