LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB54
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB54
Compare Versions
AB54 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB54 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB54 Amended August 30, 2011
AB54 Amended August 24, 2011
AB54 Amended August 22, 2011
AB54 Amended July 11, 2011
AB54 Amended June 22, 2011
AB54 Amended May 31, 2011
AB54 Amended May 19, 2011
AB54 Amended April 14, 2011
AB54 Amended April 4, 2011
AB54 Amended March 29, 2011
AB54 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB54 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB54 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB54 Amended August 30, 2011
AB54 Amended August 24, 2011
AB54 Amended August 22, 2011
AB54 Amended July 11, 2011
AB54 Amended June 22, 2011
AB54 Amended May 31, 2011
AB54 Amended May 19, 2011
AB54 Amended April 14, 2011
AB54 Amended April 4, 2011
AB54 Amended March 29, 2011
AB54 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare