|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6527.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 5. Page 4890.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 14).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|