LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB549
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB549
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB549
Compare Versions
AB549 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB549 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB549 Amended August 23, 2012
AB549 Amended June 26, 2012
AB549 Amended May 31, 2012
AB549 Amended May 2, 2012
AB549 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB549 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB549 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB549 Amended August 23, 2012
AB549 Amended June 26, 2012
AB549 Amended May 31, 2012
AB549 Amended May 2, 2012
AB549 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare