California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 23, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 31, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012