|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4281.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 5. Page 1551.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1433.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|