BILL NUMBER: AB 57CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 88 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 13, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 13, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 5, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JULY 5, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 5, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 19, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 27, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY FEBRUARY 2, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Beall (Principal coauthor: Senator Alquist) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Alejo, Bonilla, Buchanan, Campos, Fong, Gordon, Skinner, Swanson, Wieckowski, and Yamada) (Coauthor: Senator Hancock) DECEMBER 6, 2010 An act to amend Sections 66503 and 66504 of the Government Code, relating to transportation. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 57, Beall. Metropolitan Transportation Commission. The Metropolitan Transportation Commission Act creates the Metropolitan Transportation Commission as a regional agency in the 9-county San Francisco Bay Area with comprehensive regional transportation planning and other related responsibilities. Existing law requires the commission to consist of 19 members, including 2 members each from the Counties of Alameda and Santa Clara, and one member appointed by the San Francisco Bay Conservation and Development Commission, and establishes a 4-year term of office for members of the commission. This bill would, instead, require the commission to consist of 21 members, including one member appointed by the Mayor of the City of Oakland and one member appointed by the Mayor of the City of San Jose. The bill would require the initial term of those 2 members to end in February 2015. The bill would prohibit more than 3 members of the commission from being residents of the same county, as specified. The bill would require the member from the San Francisco Bay Conservation and Development Commission to be a member of that commission, a resident of San Francisco, and to be approved by the Mayor of San Francisco. By imposing new requirements on a local agency, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66503 of the Government Code is amended to read: 66503. The commission shall consist of 21 members as follows: (a) Two members each from the City and County of San Francisco and the Counties of Contra Costa and San Mateo, and three members each from the Counties of Alameda and Santa Clara. With respect to the members from the City and County of San Francisco, the mayor shall appoint one member and the board of supervisors shall appoint one member. With respect to the members from Alameda, Contra Costa, San Mateo, and Santa Clara Counties, the city selection committee organized in each county pursuant to Article 11 (commencing with Section 50270) of Chapter 1 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 5, shall appoint one member and the board of supervisors shall appoint one member. The Mayor of the City of Oakland shall be self-appointed or shall appoint a member of the Oakland City Council to serve as the third member from the County of Alameda. The Mayor of the City of San Jose shall be self-appointed or shall appoint a member of the San Jose City Council to serve as the third member from the County of Santa Clara. (b) One member each from Marin, Napa, Solano, and Sonoma Counties. The city selection committee of these counties shall furnish to the board of supervisors the names of three nominees and the board of supervisors shall appoint one of the nominees to represent the county. (c) One representative each appointed by the Association of Bay Area Governments and the San Francisco Bay Conservation and Development Commission. The representative appointed by the San Francisco Bay Conservation and Development Commission shall be a member of the commission and a resident of the City and County of San Francisco, and shall be approved by the Mayor of San Francisco. (d) One representative, who shall be a nonvoting member, appointed by the Secretary of the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency. (e) One representative each appointed by the United States Department of Transportation and Department of Housing and Urban Development. However, these representatives shall serve only if the agencies they represent are amenable to these appointments. These representatives shall be nonvoting members. (f) Public officers, whether elected or appointed, may be appointed and serve as members of the commission during their terms of public office. (g) No more than three members appointed pursuant to subdivisions (a), (b), and (c) shall be residents of the same county. SEC. 2. Section 66504 of the Government Code is amended to read: 66504. Each commissioner's term of office is four years; provided, however, that the commissioners appointed by the Mayor of the City of Oakland and the Mayor of the City of San Jose shall have an initial term of office ending in February 2015. A commissioner appointed as a public officer vacates his or her commission seat upon ceasing to hold such public office unless the appointing authority consents to completion of the term of office. Commissioners shall be selected for their special familiarity with the problems and issues in the field of transportation. SEC. 3. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district are the result of a program for which legislative authority was requested by that local agency or school district, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code and Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.