California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB57 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2010

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill June 20, 2012
Bill March 5, 2012
Bill May 19, 2011
Bill April 27, 2011
Bill February 2, 2011