|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 462, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6614.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6587.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4869.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 3624.)
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|