California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB578 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill May 30, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012
Bill January 12, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012