LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB578
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB578
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB578
Compare Versions
AB578 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB578 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB578 Amended May 30, 2012
AB578 Amended May 8, 2012
AB578 Amended January 12, 2012
AB578 Amended January 4, 2012
AB578 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB578 Chaptered September 23, 2012
AB578 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB578 Amended May 30, 2012
AB578 Amended May 8, 2012
AB578 Amended January 12, 2012
AB578 Amended January 4, 2012
AB578 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare