|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3180.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (September 9). Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 3234.).
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 3. Page 2138.).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|