California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2011

Amended

Bill August 24, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 21, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011