LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB585
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB585
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB585
Compare Versions
AB585 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB585 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB585 Amended August 24, 2011
AB585 Amended July 12, 2011
AB585 Amended June 21, 2011
AB585 Amended April 25, 2011
AB585 Amended March 31, 2011
AB585 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB585 Chaptered October 7, 2011
AB585 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB585 Amended August 24, 2011
AB585 Amended July 12, 2011
AB585 Amended June 21, 2011
AB585 Amended April 25, 2011
AB585 Amended March 31, 2011
AB585 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare