|
07/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1536.).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1281.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|