LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB614
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB614
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB614
Compare Versions
AB614 Chaptered July 8, 2011
AB614 Enrolled June 24, 2011
AB614 Amended May 3, 2011
AB614 Amended March 25, 2011
AB614 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB614 Chaptered July 8, 2011
AB614 Enrolled June 24, 2011
AB614 Amended May 3, 2011
AB614 Amended March 25, 2011
AB614 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare