California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB614 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/08/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 614CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 71 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 8, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 7, 2011 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 23, 2011 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 9, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 3, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bonilla FEBRUARY 16, 2011 An act to amend Section 48321 of the Education Code, relating to school attendance. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 614, Bonilla. School attendance review boards: member composition. Existing law authorizes the establishment of county school attendance review boards and local school attendance review boards. Existing law requires a county school attendance review board to be composed of at least a parent and 9 representatives of specified community groups. Existing law authorizes a local school attendance review board to be composed of at least a parent and 9 representatives of specified community groups. This bill would also specifically require a representative of school, county, or community mental health personnel to be appointed to a county school attendance review board. The bill would also specifically authorize a representative of school, county, or community mental health personnel to be appointed to a local school attendance review board. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 48321 of the Education Code is amended to read: 48321. (a) (1) A county school attendance review board may be established in each county. (2) The county school attendance review board, if established, shall include, but need not be limited to, all of the following: (A) A parent. (B) A representative of school districts. (C) A representative of the county probation department. (D) A representative of the county welfare department. (E) A representative of the county superintendent of schools. (F) A representative of law enforcement agencies. (G) A representative of community-based youth service centers. (H) A representative of school guidance personnel. (I) A representative of child welfare and attendance personnel. (J) A representative of school or county health care personnel. (K) A representative of school, county, or community mental health personnel. (3) The school district representatives on the county school attendance review board shall be nominated by the governing boards of school districts and shall be appointed by the county superintendent of schools. All other persons and group representatives shall be appointed by the county board of education. (4) If a county school attendance review board exists, the county superintendent of schools shall, at the beginning of each school year, convene a meeting of the county school attendance review board for the purpose of adopting plans to promote interagency and community cooperation and to reduce the duplication of services provided to youth who have serious school attendance and behavior problems. (b) (1) Local school attendance review boards may include, but need not be limited to, all of the following: (A) A parent. (B) A representative of school districts. (C) A representative of the county probation department. (D) A representative of the county welfare department. (E) A representative of the county superintendent of schools. (F) A representative of law enforcement agencies. (G) A representative of community-based youth service centers. (H) A representative of school guidance personnel. (I) A representative of child welfare and attendance personnel. (J) A representative of school or county health care personnel. (K) A representative of school, county, or community mental health personnel. (2) Other persons or group representatives shall be appointed by the county board of education. (c) The county school attendance review board may elect, pursuant to regulations adopted pursuant to Section 48324, one member as chairperson with responsibility for coordinating services of the county school attendance review board. (d) The county school attendance review board may provide for the establishment of local school attendance review boards in any number as shall be necessary to carry out the intent of this article. (e) In any county in which there is no county school attendance review board, a school district governing board may elect to establish a local school attendance review board, which shall operate in the same manner and have the same authority as a county school attendance review board. (f) The county school attendance review board may provide consultant services to, and coordinate activities of, local school attendance review boards in meeting the special needs of pupils with school attendance or school behavior problems. (g) When the county school attendance review board determines that the needs of pupils as defined in this article can best be served by a single board, the county school attendance review board may then serve as the school attendance review board for all pupils in the county, or, upon the request of any school district in the county, the county school attendance review board may serve as the school attendance review board for pupils of that district. (h) Nothing in this article is intended to prohibit any agreement on the part of counties to provide these services on a regional basis.