|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 679, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 3077.).
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2367.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 1736.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|