California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 30, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill March 30, 2011