LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB622
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB622
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB622
Compare Versions
AB622 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB622 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB622 Amended September 1, 2011
AB622 Amended August 30, 2011
AB622 Amended July 12, 2011
AB622 Amended May 27, 2011
AB622 Amended March 30, 2011
AB622 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB622 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB622 Enrolled September 16, 2011
AB622 Amended September 1, 2011
AB622 Amended August 30, 2011
AB622 Amended July 12, 2011
AB622 Amended May 27, 2011
AB622 Amended March 30, 2011
AB622 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare