|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2558.).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2018.).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1634.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1583.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|