LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB689
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB689
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB689
Compare Versions
AB689 Chaptered September 21, 2011
AB689 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB689 Amended June 27, 2011
AB689 Amended May 27, 2011
AB689 Amended May 4, 2011
AB689 Amended April 26, 2011
AB689 Amended March 31, 2011
AB689 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB689 Chaptered September 21, 2011
AB689 Enrolled August 29, 2011
AB689 Amended June 27, 2011
AB689 Amended May 27, 2011
AB689 Amended May 4, 2011
AB689 Amended April 26, 2011
AB689 Amended March 31, 2011
AB689 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare