California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill June 27, 2011
Bill May 27, 2011
Bill May 4, 2011
Bill April 26, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011