|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 666, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 13. Page 3125.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2396.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1567.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on AGRI. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 31). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/22/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 21.
|
|
|
|
12/21/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|