California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB74 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill September 2, 2011
Bill August 16, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill May 2, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill March 24, 2011