LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB74
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB74
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB74
Compare Versions
AB74 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB74 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB74 Amended September 2, 2011
AB74 Amended August 16, 2011
AB74 Amended May 11, 2011
AB74 Amended May 2, 2011
AB74 Amended April 25, 2011
AB74 Amended March 24, 2011
AB74 Introduced December 21, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB74 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB74 Enrolled September 20, 2011
AB74 Amended September 2, 2011
AB74 Amended August 16, 2011
AB74 Amended May 11, 2011
AB74 Amended May 2, 2011
AB74 Amended April 25, 2011
AB74 Amended March 24, 2011
AB74 Introduced December 21, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare