|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 222, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2384.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1863.).
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1449.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|