California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB762 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill July 7, 2011
Bill May 11, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011