LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB762
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB762
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB762
Compare Versions
AB762 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB762 Enrolled August 16, 2011
AB762 Amended July 7, 2011
AB762 Amended May 11, 2011
AB762 Amended March 31, 2011
AB762 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB762 Chaptered September 6, 2011
AB762 Enrolled August 16, 2011
AB762 Amended July 7, 2011
AB762 Amended May 11, 2011
AB762 Amended March 31, 2011
AB762 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare