California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB812 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill January 12, 2012
Bill January 4, 2012