LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB812
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB812
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB812
Compare Versions
AB812 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB812 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB812 Amended August 6, 2012
AB812 Amended January 12, 2012
AB812 Amended January 4, 2012
AB812 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB812 Chaptered September 7, 2012
AB812 Enrolled August 20, 2012
AB812 Amended August 6, 2012
AB812 Amended January 12, 2012
AB812 Amended January 4, 2012
AB812 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare