California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB812 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 812CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 230 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 7, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 13, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 16, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 12, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 4, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ma (Coauthor: Assembly Member Skinner) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 An act to add Section 42704 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 812, Ma. Solid waste: recycled asphalt. Under existing law, it is the policy of the state to conserve and protect resources by encouraging the recycling of solid waste and the purchase of those recycled materials, including recycled concrete and rubberized asphalt concrete. Under existing law, in purchasing any materials to be used in paving or paving subbase for use by the Department of Transportation or any other state agency that provides road construction and repair services, the State Procurement Officer is required to make contracts available for those items that use recycled materials. Existing law also requires the State Procurement Officer to make contracts available that use crumb rubber, as defined, unless the Director of Transportation determines that the use of the materials is not cost effective based on specified factors. This bill would authorize the Department of Transportation, by January 1, 2014, to establish specifications for the use of reclaimed asphalt pavement (RAP) of up to 40% for hot mix asphalt mixes. The bill would specify that this authorization does not limit the authority of the department to establish specifications for this use of reclaimed asphalt pavement in amounts greater than 40%. The bill would require the department to submit a report to the Legislature, by March 1, 2016, on its progress, since the year 2011, toward the development and implementation of these specifications. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 42704 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read: 42704. (a) On or before January 1, 2014, the Department of Transportation may, with input from the Caltrans/Industry Rock Products Committee, establish specifications for the use of reclaimed asphalt pavement (RAP) of up to 40 percent for hot mix asphalt mixes. (b) Subdivision (a) does not limit the authority of the Department of Transportation to establish specifications for the use of reclaimed asphalt pavement in amounts greater than 40 percent for hot mix asphalt mixes. (c) (1) On or before March 1, 2016, the Department of Transportation shall submit a report to the Legislature in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code on its progress, since the year 2011, toward the development and implementation of the specifications for reclaimed asphalt pavement, as specified in subdivision (a). (2) This subdivision shall become inoperative on March 1, 2020, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code.