|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 527, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:35 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 5. Page 6497.).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4782.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 2. Page 1655.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|