California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB880 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill March 22, 2012
Bill May 10, 2011
Bill March 25, 2011