LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB880
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB880
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB880
Compare Versions
AB880 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB880 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB880 Amended August 6, 2012
AB880 Amended March 22, 2012
AB880 Amended May 10, 2011
AB880 Amended March 25, 2011
AB880 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB880 Chaptered September 25, 2012
AB880 Enrolled September 10, 2012
AB880 Amended August 6, 2012
AB880 Amended March 22, 2012
AB880 Amended May 10, 2011
AB880 Amended March 25, 2011
AB880 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare